This case was last updated from Caddo County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 07:09:42 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V. JUDY E CAMPER

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUDY E CAMPER. This case was filed in Caddo County Courts, Caddo County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS, DAVID A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0053

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Caddo, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS, DAVID A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CAMPER, JUDY E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CLARK, LEAH K

Attorney at STEPHEN BRUCE & ASSOCIATES

Po Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION -$10,000.00 OR LESS

05/03/2021: FILE AND ENTER PETITION -$10,000.00 OR LESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURN / AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS (1 BACK ATTY); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS FEE- EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION -$10,000.00 OR LESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less