This case was last updated from Atoka County Courts on 03/26/2022 at 07:30:28 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V. CARYLON WEBSTER

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARYLON WEBSTER. This case was filed in Atoka County Courts, Atoka County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is INGE, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0028

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Atoka, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

INGE, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WEBSTER, CARYLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RAUSCH, JULIE

5200 South Yale Ave., Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND JOURNAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - C. WEBSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS BACK TO ATTORNEY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS REVOLVING FUND ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAUSCH, JULIE