This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 16:40:08 (UTC).

Discover Bank, Plaintiff, v. Sandra Whitlock, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Discover Bank, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sandra Whitlock, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-60

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Whitlock, Sandra

Clayton, OK 74536-5037

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Withrow, Lori Elise

Po Box 17248

Little Rock, AR 72222

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

08/30/2021: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE)

08/30/2021: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE)

RETURN OF SERVICE- NOT SERVED TO SANDRA WHITLOCK

02/14/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE- NOT SERVED TO SANDRA WHITLOCK

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

04/07/2022: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NO PARTIES APPEARED CASE IS DISMISSED

04/08/2022: NO PARTIES APPEARED CASE IS DISMISSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: NO PARTIES APPEARED CASE IS DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSITION HEARING DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE;; Party Details; Defendant: Whitlock, Sandra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE- NOT SERVED TO SANDRA WHITLOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-90909 ON 08/30/2021. PAYOR: ALLEN & WITHROW TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2021-60: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2021-60: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2021-60: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-60: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2021-60: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-60: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2021-60: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2021-60: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-60: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-60: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2021-60: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2021-60: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DEBERRY, MICHAEL D. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less