This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 03/22/2022 at 06:10:42 (UTC).

Discover Bank, Plaintiff, v. Randi M Watts, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Discover Bank, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Randi M Watts, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-14

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Watts, Randi M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clark, Leah

Attorney at Stephen L Bruce & Associates

P.O. Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

03/08/2021: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

RETURN OF SERVICE

04/05/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSITION HEARING DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-88854 ON 03/08/2021. PAYOR: STEPHEN L BRUCE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2021-14: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2021-14: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2021-14: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-14: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2021-14: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-14: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2021-14: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2021-14: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-14: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-14: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2021-14: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2021-14: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DEBERRY, MICHAEL D. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMINCSF; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Discover Bank; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clark, Leah