This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 01/13/2022 at 16:07:38 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK, Plaintiff, v. BRIAN K LOCKART, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 DISCOVER BANK, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIAN K LOCKART, Defendant. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hatfield, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-883

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hatfield, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LOCKART, BRIAN K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRUCE, STEPHEN L

P O Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

MASSEY, NICHOLAS L

P.O. Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

RIDDEL, KYLE W

Po Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

ALTDOERFFER, EVERETTE C

P.O. Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

CLARK, LEAH K

Attorney at STEPHEN BRUCE & ASSOCIATES

Po Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.// PETITION FILED

07/20/2018: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.// PETITION FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

09/17/2018: ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING THE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION TO RELEASE INFORMATION FILED

10/17/2018: APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING THE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION TO RELEASE INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR PLAIN S APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING THE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION TO RELEASE INFORMATION FILED

10/17/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR PLAIN S APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING THE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION TO RELEASE INFORMATION FILED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE//FILED

11/20/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE//FILED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT//FILED

11/20/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT//FILED

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT//FILED

11/20/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT//FILED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED DOCUMENT RECEIVED WITH WHITE OUT

11/30/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED DOCUMENT RECEIVED WITH WHITE OUT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED DOCUMENT RECEIVED WITH WHITE OUT; Party: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CRT MIN. MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS REQUESTED BY THE PLAIN 'S COUNSEL. THERE BEING NO RESPONSIVE PLEADING FILED, THE MOTION IS GRANTED. JUDGE BARBARA HATFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO OESC; Party: DISCOVER BANK; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: LOCKART, BRIAN K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT//FILED; Party: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MODJ; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT//FILED; Party: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE//FILED; Party: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR PLAIN S APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING THE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION TO RELEASE INFORMATION FILED; Party: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING THE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION TO RELEASE INFORMATION FILED; Party: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED; Party: LOCKART, BRIAN K

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.// PETITION FILED; Count: 1; Party: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALTDOERFFER, EVERETTE C.