This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 05/01/2022 at 09:39:54 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK, Plaintiff, v. Amy L Raper, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 DISCOVER BANK, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Amy L Raper, Defendant. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Brockman, Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2036

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Brockman, Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

Raper, Amy L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clark, Leah K

Attorney at Stephen Bruce & Associates

Po Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

 

Court Documents

PETITION

08/13/2018: PETITION

MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE AS OPEN

01/23/2019: MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE AS OPEN

ORDER CONTINUING CASE AS OPEN *** SFB ***

01/28/2019: ORDER CONTINUING CASE AS OPEN *** SFB ***

MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE AS OPEN

07/24/2019: MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE AS OPEN

ORDER TO CONTINUING CASE AS OPEN (SFB)

07/31/2019: ORDER TO CONTINUING CASE AS OPEN (SFB)

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

08/19/2019: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

08/19/2019: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION / $88.15 / 8-22-2019 & 8-29-2019 & 9-5-2019 / NOTICE BY PUBLICATION / NORMAN TRANSCRIPT

09/05/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / $88.15 / 8-22-2019 & 8-29-2019 & 9-5-2019 / NOTICE BY PUBLICATION / NORMAN TRANSCRIPT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION 8-22-19 8-29-19 9-5-19

09/25/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION 8-22-19 8-29-19 9-5-19

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

12/03/2019: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SB)

12/03/2019: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SB)

AFFIDAVIT

12/03/2019: AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/09/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCode: GSS; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS SERVED/PPS/SCOVILLE'S LLC WAS SERVED BY SERVING BETTY JOHNSON AS MANAGER ON 3-4-2020; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY /SCOVILLE'S LLC $0 (NOT EMPLOYED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-1122031 ON 02/24/2020. PAYOR: STEPHEN L BRUCE PC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-2036: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-2036: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-2036: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-2036: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-2036: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-2036: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-2036: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-2036: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY / DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT)

    Read MoreRead Less