This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 09/18/2022 at 09:28:14 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER V. RON ZABEL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against RON ZABEL. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0323

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER

Defendant

ZABEL, RON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRUCE, STEPHEN L. PC

Attorney at BRUCE, STEPHEN L. PC

P.O. Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

 

Court Documents

FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/11/2021: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT- BANCFIRST

01/20/2022: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT- BANCFIRST

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-BANCFIRST 1-26-22

02/07/2022: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-BANCFIRST 1-26-22

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

06/28/2021: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-RON SERVED 7-13-21

07/21/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-RON SERVED 7-13-21

FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILILATRY SERVICE

08/18/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILILATRY SERVICE

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

08/18/2021: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/30/2021: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

01/31/2022: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-BANCFIRST 1-26-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less