This case was last updated from Sequoyah County Courts on 03/20/2022 at 00:01:45 (UTC).

DIRECT CAPITAL, A DIVISION OF CIT B NA V. SYED SALEEM

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 DIRECT CAPITAL, A DIVISION OF CIT B NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SYED SALEEM. This case was filed in Sequoyah County Courts, Sequoyah County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, KYLE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0045

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sequoyah, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, KYLE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIRECT CAPITAL, A DIVISION OF CIT B NA

Defendant

SALEEM, SYED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEHMAN, SCOTT F.

Attorney at LATHAM,STALL,WAGNER,STEELE & LEHMAN, PC.

1437 South Boulder, Suite 820

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BK TO ATTY

03/18/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BK TO ATTY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

10/04/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: WATERS CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION TO SET HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAXED ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED BK TO ATTY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FILED (CIVIL 10,001.00 OR MORE); Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less