This case was last updated from Pittsburg County Courts on 07/28/2022 at 15:57:14 (UTC).

DIFRANGIA PROPERTIES, LLC V. ANGIE RICH

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 DIFRANGIA PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGIE RICH. This case was filed in Pittsburg County Courts, Pittsburg County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0351

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pittsburg, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIFRANGIA PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant

RICH, ANGIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HACKLER, DEBORAH

P.O. Box 954

Mcalester,, OK 74502

 

Court Documents

ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER

06/30/2022: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/30/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT RETURNED W/PROOF OF SERVICE. SERVED ON

07/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT RETURNED W/PROOF OF SERVICE. SERVED ON

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $50.00. S/MCLAUGHLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: IN 15 DAYS POSTS APPEAL BOND. PROCESS SERVICE FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WHICH A WRIT OF ASSISTANCE MAY ISSUE UNLESS DEFT WITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FEE OF $200.00. POSSESSION OF PREMISES TO PLAIN IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMOUNT OF $2000.00, TOGETHER W/COURT COSTS, AN ATTNY'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMOUNT OWED. JUDGMENT WAS ENTERED FOR PLAIN IN THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT: ALL PARTIES ARE PRESENT. PARTIES AGREED ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 7/10/22 BY PROCESS SERVER ALFRED BULLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT RETURNED W/PROOF OF SERVICE. SERVED ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HACKLER, DEBORAH