This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 02:19:21 (UTC).

DIAMOND FINANCE V. DONNA HARRIS

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 DIAMOND FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DONNA HARRIS. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0051

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAMOND FINANCE

Defendant

HARRIS, DONNA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CARD RETURNED SIGNED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONT POSTJGMNT EARNINGS GARN SUMMONS FILED ISS CERT ML; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% COJC TO CCRF; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COJC; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% CASA TO CCRF; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CASA; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND SUMMONS; Amount: $ 73.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFF/ORDER RETURNED SERVED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER UNDER 5000.00; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less