This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 04/24/2022 at 16:16:16 (UTC).

DIAMOND FINANCE V. DESMOND JAMAL MOORE

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 DIAMOND FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DESMOND JAMAL MOORE. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAZE, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0155

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAZE, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAMOND FINANCE

Defendant

MOORE, DESMOND JAMAL

 

Court Documents

ORDER, PLAIN APPEARED, DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR,

12/02/2021: ORDER, PLAIN APPEARED, DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR,

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GREEN CARD RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER (Civil,Divorce,S.C.,Adop.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $643.82.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLAIN IN THE AMOUNT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER, PLAIN APPEARED, DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETUNRED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT/ORDER TO:; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less