This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 09/04/2021 at 05:40:23 (UTC).

DIAMOND FINANCE V. AURELIO TORRES

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 DIAMOND FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AURELIO TORRES. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is LITTLEFIELD, ALICIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0589

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

LITTLEFIELD, ALICIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAMOND FINANCE

Defendant

TORRES, AURELIO

 

Court Documents

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT

10/17/2018: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT

ISSUING/FILING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT/SUMMONS TO CARGILL

10/17/2018: ISSUING/FILING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT/SUMMONS TO CARGILL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketDescription: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AFFIDAVIT - $442.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AFFIDAVIT - $447.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AFFIDAVIT - $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketDescription: 7611 - SIGNED BY RICK OLSON ON 10/22/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketDescription: RETURN RECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL #7018 1130 0001 4896

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketDescription: 4896 7611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketDescription: MEAT SOLUTIONS CORP BY CERTIFIED MAIL #7018 1130 0001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ISSUING/FILING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT/SUMMONS TO CARGILL; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketDescription: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketDescription: TORRES ON 9/4/18 BY JEFF LELAND - FEE $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketDescription: ALIAS #1 ORDER AND RETURN - PERSONALLY SERVED AURELIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: ISSUING/FILING ALIAS #1 ORDER TO PLAIN FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AND RETURN - NO SERVICE - FEE $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: ISSUING ORDER TO PLAIN FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less