This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 11:19:42 (UTC).

Diamond Finance, Plaintiff, v. John Martin, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Diamond Finance, Plaintiff, filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against John Martin, Defendant. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-52

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diamond Finance

Defendant

Martin, John

 

Court Documents

ALIAS ORDER WITH AMENDED AFFIDAVIT (NEW ADDRESS)

02/28/2020: ALIAS ORDER WITH AMENDED AFFIDAVIT (NEW ADDRESS)

JUDGE SMITH NO CR COMES ON FOR INDEBT HEARING AMBER GUNTER PRESENT FOR PLAIN , SWORN DEFENDANT APPEARS NOT ALIAS GRANTED

02/26/2020: JUDGE SMITH NO CR COMES ON FOR INDEBT HEARING AMBER GUNTER PRESENT FOR PLAIN , SWORN DEFENDANT APPEARS NOT ALIAS GRANTED

AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT

JUDGE SMITH NO CR NO APPEARANCES PURSUANT TO COURTHOUSE CLOSURE REGARDING COVID-19 COURT ORDERS CASE RESET PER AO-2020-16 DATE TO BE DETERMINED

04/01/2020: JUDGE SMITH NO CR NO APPEARANCES PURSUANT TO COURTHOUSE CLOSURE REGARDING COVID-19 COURT ORDERS CASE RESET PER AO-2020-16 DATE TO BE DETERMINED

RETURN OF SERVICE WITH AMENDED AFFIDAVIT & ALIAS ORDER ATTACHED ( PPS / JOHN MARTIN - 3-9-20) $40

03/13/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE WITH AMENDED AFFIDAVIT & ALIAS ORDER ATTACHED ( PPS / JOHN MARTIN - 3-9-20) $40

DISMISSAL

05/15/2020: DISMISSAL

JUDGE SMITH NO CR NO APPEARANCES DUE TO COURTHOUSE CLOSURE REGARDING COVID-19 PURSUANT TO A0-2020-16 COURT ORDERS CASE RESET MATTER RESET TO 6-3-2020 @ 1:30 PM BAILIFF TO MAIL OUT NOTICE

05/07/2020: JUDGE SMITH NO CR NO APPEARANCES DUE TO COURTHOUSE CLOSURE REGARDING COVID-19 PURSUANT TO A0-2020-16 COURT ORDERS CASE RESET MATTER RESET TO 6-3-2020 @ 1:30 PM BAILIFF TO MAIL OUT NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: INDEBT1 ($1185.00 + 58.00 CC ); Docket: David Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SMITH; NO CR COMES ON FOR HEARING; GALELA BIRDWELL PRESENT, SWORN; DEFENDANT APPEARS NOT; MATTER PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED;; Party Details; Defendant: Martin, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISM; Description: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SMITH; NO CR NO APPEARANCES DUE TO COURTHOUSE CLOSURE REGARDING COVID-19; PURSUANT TO A0-2020-16 COURT ORDERS CASE RESET; MATTER RESET TO 6-3-2020 @ 1:30 PM; BAILIFF TO MAIL OUT NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: INDEBT1($1185.00 + $58.00 CC) ALIAS; Docket: David Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SMITH; NO CR NO APPEARANCES; PURSUANT TO COURTHOUSE CLOSURE REGARDING COVID-19; COURT ORDERS CASE RESET PER AO-2020-16; DATE TO BE DETERMINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE WITH AMENDED AFFIDAVIT & ALIAS ORDER ATTACHED ( PPS / JOHN MARTIN - 3-9-20) $40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ALIAS ORDER WITH AMENDED AFFIDAVIT (NEW ADDRESS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • HearingEvent: INDEBT1($1185.00 + $58.00 CC); Docket: David Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SMITH; NO CR COMES ON FOR INDEBT HEARING; AMBER GUNTER PRESENT FOR PLAIN , SWORN; DEFENDANT APPEARS NOT; ALIAS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-609308 ON 01/22/2020. PAYOR: DIAMOND FINANCE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2020-52: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2020-52: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2020-52: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SMITH, DAVID TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: Diamond Finance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less