This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 20:21:29 (UTC).

DIAMOND FINANCE CO. V. TONIA SHOMO

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 DIAMOND FINANCE CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TONIA SHOMO. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0297

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAMOND FINANCE CO.

Defendant

SHOMO, TONIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE RET RECT 7018 0680 0000 5346 4666

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE 7018 0680 0000 5346 4666; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS/ISSUE; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDG 305.00 + 108.00CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE RETURN OF SERVICE/SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JASON RICKETTS TO SERVE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less