This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 00:58:00 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C V. OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SULLIVAN, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0089

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SULLIVAN, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C

Defendants

SCHNEIDER, JEANENE

SPOUSE IF ANY

DOE, JOHN

OCCUPANT

DISCOVER BANK

STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL DHS

OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CEJDA, KIRK J.

770 N.E. 63Rd St.

Okc, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

06/29/2021: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

ISSUE SUMMONS X 5

06/29/2021: ISSUE SUMMONS X 5

FILE JUDGMENT

09/20/2021: FILE JUDGMENT

ISSUE SPECIAL EXECUTION

09/23/2021: ISSUE SPECIAL EXECUTION

FILE RETURN

11/30/2021: FILE RETURN

FILE MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

11/30/2021: FILE MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

APPLICATION TO VACATE SHERIFF'S SALE

12/20/2021: APPLICATION TO VACATE SHERIFF'S SALE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingEvent: SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN ALIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less