This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:33:05 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C V. DOE JANE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DOE JANE. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNEY, BARRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0013

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DENNEY, BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C

Defendants

JANE, DOE

JOHN DOE

SPOUSE OF KENDALL READING

READING, KENDALL RAY

WESTMARK MORTGAGE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TIMBERLAKE, DON J.

Attorney at BAER & TIMBERLAKE, P.C.

4200 Perimeter Center Drive, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR OVER 10,000

02/19/2021: PETITION FOR OVER 10,000

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/19/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

06/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

06/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

06/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

04/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

SPECIAL EXECUTION & ORDER OF SALE (WITH APPRAISEMENT)

04/21/2022: SPECIAL EXECUTION & ORDER OF SALE (WITH APPRAISEMENT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2024
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL-COURT CLERK TRACKING ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • HearingEvent: MD MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM 28 O.S. 152; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND- EFFECTIVE 1-1-05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR OVER 10,000; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMBERLAKE, DON J