This case was last updated from Craig County Courts on 12/20/2021 at 00:34:14 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BAN V. TOMMY TIPTON

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOMMY TIPTON. This case was filed in Craig County Courts, Craig County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0061

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Craig, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BAN

Defendant

TIPTON, TOMMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRYANT, MIKAEL

42 Shepherd Center2401 Nowthwest Twenty Third Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73107

MORGAN & ASSOCIATES

Attorney at MORGAN & ASSOCIATES

2601 N.W. Expressway Suite 205 E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

RUFF, LAUREN CAMILLE

2401 Northwest 23Rd Street, Suite 42

Oklahoma City, OK 73107

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2030
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND RELEASE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ATTESTATION AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAIN 'S PEITITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SUMMONS-SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less