This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 07/19/2023 at 05:33:48 (UTC).

DEBORAH MCLAUGHLIN, Plaintiff, v. BEULAH DONNOE, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 DEBORAH MCLAUGHLIN, Plaintiff, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEULAH DONNOE, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2759

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCLAUGHLIN, DEBORAH

Defendant

DONNOE, BEULAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LACOURSE, JOEL

Defendant Attorney

MCKENNEY, SHANDA

 

Court Documents

PETITION

09/06/2022: PETITION

PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. / BEULAH DONNOE / 9-13-22

09/16/2022: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. / BEULAH DONNOE / 9-13-22

AMENDED PETITION

09/21/2022: AMENDED PETITION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / ATTORNEY JOHN J BOWLING / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / 09-28-22

09/29/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / ATTORNEY JOHN J BOWLING / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / 09-28-22

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BELUAH DONNE / ADMISSONS AND DENIAL / AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING 9-28-22

09/29/2022: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BELUAH DONNE / ADMISSONS AND DENIAL / AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING 9-28-22

APPLICATION FOR A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE / C TO J / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/09/2022: APPLICATION FOR A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE / C TO J / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE / ON 11-29-22 @ 10:30 AM IN ROOM 708 / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/22/2022: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE / ON 11-29-22 @ 10:30 AM IN ROOM 708 / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER / 11-28-22

11/29/2022: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER / 11-28-22

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING / AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER FILED 11-29-22

12/02/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING / AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER FILED 11-29-22

PLAIN 'S PRELIMINARY WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/05/2023: PLAIN 'S PRELIMINARY WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / SHANDA M MCKENNEY ENTRY AS COUNSEL / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/02/2023: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / SHANDA M MCKENNEY ENTRY AS COUNSEL / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PLAIN 'S FINAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/10/2023: PLAIN 'S FINAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - PF - JOEL LACOURSE - DEF - JOHN BOWLING; Docket: Civil Docket A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WL; Description: PLAIN 'S FINAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / SHANDA M MCKENNEY ENTRY AS COUNSEL / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WL; Description: PLAIN 'S PRELIMINARY WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING / AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER FILED 11-29-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SCHO; Description: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER / 11-28-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: NIGHTINGALE, REBECCA: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET 10-9-23 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 708. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET 11-29-22 AT 10:30 AM IS STRICKEN. ((ORDER PLACED IN JUDGE'S OUTBOX TO BE PICKED UP FOR FILING))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE / ON 11-29-22 @ 10:30 AM IN ROOM 708 / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: NIGHTINGALE, REBECCA : ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ENTERED. SCHEDULIING CONFERENCE SET ON 11-29-22 AT 10:30 AM IN COURTROOM 708. ((ORDER IS PLACED IN JUDGE'S OUTBOX TO BE PICKED UP FOR FILING))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION FOR A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE / C TO J / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCode: NEGL; Description: NEGLIGENCE (GENERAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: NEGLIGENCE (GENERAL)(NEGL); Filed By: MCLAUGHLIN, DEBORAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less