This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 01/02/2023 at 14:40:12 (UTC).

DBA, ET. AL. V. RANDALL OLDCROW

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 DBA, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RANDALL OLDCROW. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0338

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLINTON HMA, LLC

DBA

ALLIANCE HEALTH CLINTON

Defendant

OLDCROW, RANDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JAMES, KRISTEN N.

Attorney at THE DELONEY LAW GROUP PLLC

6440 N Central Expressway Suite 850

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

08/17/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: RANDALL OLDCROW

08/24/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: RANDALL OLDCROW

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

01/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

10/06/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILE AND SCAN

10/26/2022: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILE AND SCAN

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES FILE AND SCAN

10/26/2022: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES FILE AND SCAN

SERVICE MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT FIL AND SCAN

10/26/2022: SERVICE MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT FIL AND SCAN

CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FILE AND SCAN

10/26/2022: CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FILE AND SCAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET - JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS; FILE AND SCAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT; FIL AND SCAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES; FILE AND SCAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT; FILE AND SCAN; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less