This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 04/08/2022 at 22:50:08 (UTC).

DAVID DANIELS, ET. AL. V. JERRIE SUE WRIGHT

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 DAVID DANIELS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JERRIE SUE WRIGHT. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0024

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIELS, DAVID

ADAMS, CRYSTAL

Defendant

WRIGHT, JERRIE SUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HUMMEL, TIMOTHY B

500 West Main Street Suite 102

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

SHELTON, JIMMIE

Po Box 7218

London, KY 40742

 

Court Documents

COURT ORDER: THIS MATTER IS SET FOR SCHEDULING

07/29/2021: COURT ORDER: THIS MATTER IS SET FOR SCHEDULING

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROSECUTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAWFUL NOTICE. DEFENDANT APPEARS BY JIMMIE SHELTON. THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONFERENCE. PLAIN FAILS TO APPEAR AFTER DUE AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CO: COURT ORDER: THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR SCHEDULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAILURE TO APPEAR WILL RESULT IN THIS MATTER BEING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 4, 2022 AT 9:30 A.M. PLAIN S ARE ADVISED THAT THEIR

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelton, Jimmie