This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 13:15:12 (UTC).

DANNY DEVINEY V. WOODLAKE PROPERTIES

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 DANNY DEVINEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WOODLAKE PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CAWTHON, J. DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1082

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CAWTHON, J. DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEVINEY, DANNY

Defendant

WOODLAKE PROPERTIES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE OFFER OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE- SERVED 9-4-18 BY POTT. CO. SHRF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE- SERVED 9-4-18 BY POTT. CO. SHRF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFENDANT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING SET 10-31-18 AT 9:00AM CT RM 3 SH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: POTT CO TO SERVIE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less