This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 09:19:46 (UTC).

DANIEL CERVANTES, ET. AL. V. MOBIL-REAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 DANIEL CERVANTES, filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MOBIL-REAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0019

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CERVANTES, DANIEL

MCDANIEL, ALLYSON

Defendant

MOBIL-REAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VORNDRAN, JOE

130 N. Broadway, Ste. 100

Shawnee, OK 74801

LASTER, LUKE

130 N. Broadway Ave Suite 100

Shawnee, OK 74801

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

01/13/2023: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- JOSEPH M. VORNDRAN,

01/13/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- JOSEPH M. VORNDRAN,

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MOBIL-REAL CORPORATION,

02/03/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MOBIL-REAL CORPORATION,

FILE ANSWER

02/16/2023: FILE ANSWER

FILEE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/16/2023: FILEE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/16/2023: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE MOTION TO STIKE EICHLER'S LETTER AS UNATHORIZED

02/22/2023: FILE MOTION TO STIKE EICHLER'S LETTER AS UNATHORIZED

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

02/23/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRACTICE OF LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO STIKE EICHLER'S LETTER AS UNATHORIZED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILEE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVED 1-16-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MOBIL-REAL CORPORATION,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less