This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/12/2023 at 04:15:23 (UTC).

DALTON GILCHRIST, ET. AL. V. JAYLON ORANGE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 DALTON GILCHRIST, filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JAYLON ORANGE,. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0424

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GILCHRIST, DALTON

BARTON, RODNEY

BARTON, TRENTON

Defendants

ORANGE, JAYLON

ORANGE, SHALANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILSON, GREG

MCKENNEY, SHANDA

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

12/23/2022: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- GREG WILSON

12/23/2022: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- GREG WILSON

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN-JAYLON, SERVED BY LEAVING A COPY

02/06/2023: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN-JAYLON, SERVED BY LEAVING A COPY

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- SHALANDA, SERVED BY LEAVING A

02/06/2023: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- SHALANDA, SERVED BY LEAVING A

FILE SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS OF

02/16/2023: FILE SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS OF

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- SHANDA MCKENNY ON BEHALF OF

02/17/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- SHANDA MCKENNY ON BEHALF OF

FILE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JAYLON ORANGE ONLY

02/17/2023: FILE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JAYLON ORANGE ONLY

FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS-

02/24/2023: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS-

FILE COURT MINUTE- MOTION TO DISMISS GRANTED

03/16/2023: FILE COURT MINUTE- MOTION TO DISMISS GRANTED

FILE ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS

03/16/2023: FILE ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE- MOTION TO DISMISS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 3-16-23 AT 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JAYLON ORANGE ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF JAYLON ORANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- SHANDA MCKENNY ON BEHALF OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT SHALANDA ORANGE WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less