This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 05:43:15 (UTC).

D & E RENTALS V. GWEN BROWN, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 D E RENTALS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GWEN BROWN. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0175

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D & E RENTALS

Defendants

BROWN, KUSHELL

AND/OR

BROWN, GWEN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

08/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

08/17/2021: ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

NON JURY JUDGMENT FILE AND SCAN

08/18/2021: NON JURY JUDGMENT FILE AND SCAN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

08/18/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AT 1021 AVANT CLINTON, OK BY 08/31/2021 BY 5:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT TO RETURN POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 108.00 COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NON JURY JUDGMENT; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CO BY PATCH MCCOMAS PS 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF SERVED ON 08/13/2021 AT 1021 ORIENT CLINTON, CUSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SERVE BY PROCESS SERVER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less