This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 03/29/2022 at 02:58:36 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC V. MICHAEL JAY WATSON

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL JAY WATSON. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNEY, BARRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0099

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DENNEY, BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

WATSON, MICHAEL JAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RAUSCH, JULIE

5200 S Yale Ave Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

 

Court Documents

PETITION $10,000 OR LESS

05/19/2021: PETITION $10,000 OR LESS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/08/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING 11-18-21 AT 10:00 A.M.

11/09/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING 11-18-21 AT 10:00 A.M.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT SIGNED BY BAIRD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GRANTS MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM BD COMES ON FOR MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING 11-18-21 AT 10:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND- EFFECTIVE 1-1-05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION $10,000 OR LESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAUSCH, JULIE