This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 09:41:45 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC V. NORMAN JAMES KISSLER

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORMAN JAMES KISSLER. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0369

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC

Defendant

KISSLER, NORMAN JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COOLEY, NEIL

Attorney at LOVE BEAL & NIXON P.C.

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

09/09/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: NORMAN KISSLER

09/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: NORMAN KISSLER

CM: SCJ

04/12/2022: CM: SCJ

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

04/15/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

10/25/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILE AND SCAN

04/18/2022: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILE AND SCAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; FILE AND SCAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER TO THE PLAIN OR THE PLAIN 'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE COURT CLERK IS DIRECTED TO MAIL A COPY OF THIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AS TO WHY SERVICE WAS NOT MADE WITHIN THAT PERIOD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION. THE PLAIN HAS FAILED TO SHOW GOOD CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOLEY, NEIL