This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 11/11/2021 at 07:45:01 (UTC).

Credit Bureau Services Association v. Williams, Tasha

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 Credit Bureau Services Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Williams, Tasha. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Corley, Phillip C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-354

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Corley, Phillip C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Bureau Services Association

Defendant

Williams, Tasha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Plank, Bryan Allen

Attorney at Plank Law Firm

Po Box 489

Stillwater, OK 74076

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/07/2018: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

06/07/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

06/07/2018: APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED TASHA WILLIAMS ON 6-18-18 / PSS

06/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED TASHA WILLIAMS ON 6-18-18 / PSS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/02/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/02/2018: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER OF JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY)

08/02/2018: ORDER OF JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY)

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

08/16/2018: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

08/16/2018: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

09/10/2018: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

APPLICATION AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

01/18/2019: APPLICATION AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

APPLICATION AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

05/15/2019: APPLICATION AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

ORDER AS TO PLAIN 'S ENTITLEMENT TO THE ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDERS (JUDGE CORLEY)

06/06/2019: ORDER AS TO PLAIN 'S ENTITLEMENT TO THE ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDERS (JUDGE CORLEY)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • HearingEvent: Plain 's Application and Notice Regarding Plain 's Request for Order to the OESC and Request for the Issuance of an OESC Order; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association; Docket: Phillip C. Corley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE CORLEY: THIS CASE COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON PLAIN 'S APPLICATION AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER. PLAIN APPEARS BY COUNSEL. DEFENDANT DOES NOT APPEAR. THE REQUEST IS SUSTAINED AS PER ORDER ENTERED.; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER AS TO PLAIN 'S ENTITLEMENT TO THE ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDERS (JUDGE CORLEY); Party: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • HearingEvent: Plain 's Application and Notice Regarding Plain 's Request for Order to the OESC and Request for the Issuance of an OESC Order; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association; Docket: Phillip C. Corley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE CORLEY: THIS CASE COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON PLAIN 'S APPLICATION AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER. PLAIN APPEARS BY COUNSEL. THE APPLICATION IS SUSTAINED AS PER ORDER ENTERED.; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE CORLEY: DUE TO THE COURTHOUSE BEING CLOSED FOR ICY ROADS THIS CASE IS RESET TO MARCH 7, 2019 AT 1:30 P.M.; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: Williams, Tasha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-581386 ON 08/16/2018. PAYOR: CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIATION TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 106.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-354: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-354: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-354: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-354: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-354: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-354: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-354: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less