This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 02:49:16 (UTC).

Credit Bureau Services Association v. Webb, James Keith

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 Credit Bureau Services Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Webb, James Keith. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Kistler, Stephen R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-355

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Kistler, Stephen R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Bureau Services Association

Defendant

Webb, James Keith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Plank, Bryan Allen

Attorney at Plank Law Firm

Po Box 489

Stillwater, OK 74076

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/07/2018: PETITION

APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

06/07/2018: APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/17/2018: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

06/28/2019: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

12/14/2018: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

06/28/2019: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

06/28/2019: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION

SUMMONS RETURNED/SERVED JAMES WEBB PERSONALLY ON 6-12-2018/PPS

06/19/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED/SERVED JAMES WEBB PERSONALLY ON 6-12-2018/PPS

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

12/14/2018: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED;; Party Details; Defendant: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RSJ; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER / AFFDAVIT AND CALCULATION; Party: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AND CALCULATION; Party: Webb, James Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less