This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 16:02:56 (UTC).

Credit Bureau Services Association v. Pelts, Recinda Mishawn

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 Credit Bureau Services Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pelts, Recinda Mishawn. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Kistler, Stephen R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-345

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Kistler, Stephen R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Bureau Services Association

Defendant

Pelts, Recinda Mishawn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Plank, Bryan Allen

Attorney at Plank Law Firm

Po Box 489

Stillwater, OK 74076

 

Court Documents

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

08/16/2018: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

07/26/2019: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

PETITION

06/07/2018: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/27/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

07/26/2019: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

SUMMONS RETURNED/SERVED RECINDA PELTS PERSONALLY ON 6-12-2018/PPS

06/19/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED/SERVED RECINDA PELTS PERSONALLY ON 6-12-2018/PPS

APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

06/07/2018: APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

08/16/2018: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

06/07/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-679277 ON 06/01/2022. PAYOR: CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIATION TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-345: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-345: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-345: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-345: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-345: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-345: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-345: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-345: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY; Party: Pelts, Recinda Mishawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less