This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 11/11/2021 at 08:05:42 (UTC).

Credit Bureau Services Association v. Morrow, Lisa Colleen

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 Credit Bureau Services Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Morrow, Lisa Colleen. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Corley, Phillip C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-347

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Corley, Phillip C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Bureau Services Association

Defendant

Morrow, Lisa Colleen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Plank, Bryan Allen

Attorney at Plank Law Firm

Po Box 489

Stillwater, OK 74076

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/07/2018: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

06/07/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

06/07/2018: APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE (SERVED AT RESIDENCE)

07/03/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE (SERVED AT RESIDENCE)

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

09/07/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

09/07/2018: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER OF JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY)

10/04/2018: ORDER OF JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY)

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

01/08/2019: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

01/08/2019: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

02/04/2019: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

02/21/2019: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

03/08/2019: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

03/15/2019: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

04/01/2019: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

04/12/2019: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

04/25/2019: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

05/22/2019: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED;; Party Details; Defendant: Morrow, Lisa Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RSJ; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Party: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: Morrow, Lisa Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: Morrow, Lisa Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: Morrow, Lisa Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: Morrow, Lisa Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: Morrow, Lisa Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: Morrow, Lisa Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: CALCULATION FOR GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS; Party: Morrow, Lisa Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2019-593317 ON 01/08/2019. PAYOR: CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIATION TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 106.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-347: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-347: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-347: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-347: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-347: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-347: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-347: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Credit Bureau Services Association

    Read MoreRead Less