This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 01/08/2023 at 01:50:11 (UTC).

CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIA V. JASON CRISP, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON CRISP,. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0408

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIA

Defendants

CRISP, LINDSEY D.

CRISP, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PLANK, BRYAN A.

Attorney at PLANK LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 489

Stillwater, OK 74076

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

10/22/2020: FILE & ENTER PETITION

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDER FILE AND SCAN

10/22/2020: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDER FILE AND SCAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: JASON CRISP

10/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: JASON CRISP

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: LINDSEY CRISP

10/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: LINDSEY CRISP

SUMMONS SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

11/17/2020: SUMMONS SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

03/17/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

CM: SCJ

04/14/2021: CM: SCJ

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

04/27/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

DISMISSAL WITH DISMISSAL FILE AND SCAN

06/07/2021: DISMISSAL WITH DISMISSAL FILE AND SCAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET - JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH DISMISSAL; FILE AND SCAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET - JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: A.M. FOR STATUS CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 27, 2021 AT 9:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADDITIONAL TIME TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO MAKE PAYMENTS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN APPEARS BY ATTORNEY PLANK AND REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: SCJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less