This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 10/08/2022 at 14:05:58 (UTC).

CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIA V. DIA SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIA SMITH. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0231

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT BUREAU SERVICES ASSOCIA

Defendant

SMITH, DIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PLANK, BRYAN A.

Attorney at PLANK LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 489

Stillwater, OK 74076

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

07/29/2021: SUMMONS SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

GARNISHMENT DELIVERY FILE AND SCAN

04/19/2022: GARNISHMENT DELIVERY FILE AND SCAN

ORDER DIRECTING GARNISHEE TO FILE AND ANSWER AND

04/27/2022: ORDER DIRECTING GARNISHEE TO FILE AND ANSWER AND

FILE & ENTER PETITION

07/12/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: DIA SMITH

07/12/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: DIA SMITH

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDER FILE AND SCAN

07/12/2021: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDER FILE AND SCAN

ORDER OF JUDGMENT FIL AND SCAN

09/24/2021: ORDER OF JUDGMENT FIL AND SCAN

MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILE AND SCAN

09/27/2021: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILE AND SCAN

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FIEL AND SCAN

09/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FIEL AND SCAN

CONTINUING WAGE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT

10/26/2021: CONTINUING WAGE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT

CONTINUING WAGE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY/PLTF

11/01/2021: CONTINUING WAGE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY/PLTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT; FILE AND SCAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DELIVER MONEY TO PLAIN -JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER DIRECTING GARNISHEE TO FILE AND ANSWER AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT DELIVERY; FILE AND SCAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less