This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 02:02:24 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation, Plaintiff, v. Jeffery Burch, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Credit Acceptance Corporation, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeffery Burch, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Burton, Catherine M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-464

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Burton, Catherine M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendant

Burch, Jeffery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

METZER, GREG A

Attorney at METZER & AUSTIN, P.L.L.C,

1 South Broadway Suite 100

Edmond, OK 73034

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JEFFERY BURCH BY PERS. SERV. ON 2/7/22

02/10/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JEFFERY BURCH BY PERS. SERV. ON 2/7/22

MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

03/21/2022: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/07/2022: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEDF; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Default Judgment; Party Details; Defendant: Burch, Jeffery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDJ; Description: BURTON: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED; Count: 1; Party: Burch, Jeffery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JEFFERY BURCH BY PERS. SERV. ON 2/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-5130648 ON 01/21/2022. PAYOR: METZER & AUSTIN PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2022-464: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2022-464: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2022-464: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2022-464: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2022-464: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2022-464: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2022-464: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2022-464: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2022-464: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2022-464: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2022-464: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2022-464: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BURTON, CATHERINE M. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: P; Description: PETITION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: CreditAcceptance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less