This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 08:44:27 (UTC).

COURTESY LOANS V. ROBIN THOMAS

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 COURTESY LOANS filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBIN THOMAS. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0120

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COURTESY LOANS

Defendant

THOMAS, ROBIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT (RETURNED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING 9171082133393826051916; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 63.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (COPIES MAILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • HearingEvent: SC SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT (RET'D) FROM PPS SERVING: ROBIN THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER AFFIDAVIT & ORDER RECOVERY OF $ / REPLEV; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less