This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 04/24/2022 at 13:42:57 (UTC).

COURTESY LOANS V. MARCUS ERVIN

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 COURTESY LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARCUS ERVIN. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KENDALL, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0090

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KENDALL, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COURTESY LOANS

Defendant

ERVIN, MARCUS

 

Court Documents

ORIG SMALL CLAIM AFFID RET'D- MARCUS ERVIN-NOT FOUND

05/17/2021: ORIG SMALL CLAIM AFFID RET'D- MARCUS ERVIN-NOT FOUND

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SIGNATURE OF RECIPIENT- USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORIG SMALL CLAIM AFFID RET'D- MARCUS ERVIN-NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL-SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (SK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS JUDG- JUDG FOR PLTF FOR $1,186.70 + COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE BY SHF; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT & ORDER ISSUED (BY SHF); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less