This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 13:01:45 (UTC).

COURTESY LOANS V. BUFFY HOLMAN

Case Summary

On 06/11/2018 COURTESY LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BUFFY HOLMAN. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KENDALL, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0151

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KENDALL, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COURTESY LOANS

Defendant

HOLMAN, BUFFY

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS JUDG- JUDG FOR PLTF FOR $548.13 + COSTS.

07/10/2018: SMALL CLAIMS JUDG- JUDG FOR PLTF FOR $548.13 + COSTS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CO. CLERK 7/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GREEN CARD RET'D- SIGNED BY LOANEY BLACKBURN FOR GARVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: JUDGMENT GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (SK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS JUDG- JUDG FOR PLTF FOR $548.13 + COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 6/13/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORIGINAL SMALL CLAIM AFFID RET'D- SERVED BUFFY HOLMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT & ORDER ISSUED (BY PPS); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less