This case was last updated from Pontotoc County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 10:35:43 (UTC).

COUNCIL ON LAW ENFORCEMENT ED, ET. AL. V. BRENT ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 05/22/2018 COUNCIL ON LAW ENFORCEMENT ED filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRENT ROBERTS. This case was filed in Pontotoc County Courts, Pontotoc County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is POLLARD, GREG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0545

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pontotoc, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

POLLARD, GREG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COUNCIL ON LAW ENFORCEMENT ED

C.L.E.E.T.

Defendant

ROBERTS, BRENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KONKLER, GERALD W.

C.L.E.E.T., 2401 Egypt Rd

Ada, OK 74820

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 70 OS & 3311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 1.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CANCELLED NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ISSUE AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER TO PLAIN; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEPOSIT BY CLEET CREDIT CARD BY PHONE $58.00

    Read MoreRead Less