This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 21:36:06 (UTC).

Conn Appliances, Inc, Plaintiff, v. Joy D Griffith, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Conn Appliances, Inc, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joy D Griffith, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Pipes, Robert Trent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-548

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Pipes, Robert Trent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances, Inc

Defendant

Griffith, Joy D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOLEY, NEIL

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON, P.C.

P.O.Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ENLARGEMENT OF TIME ON BEHALF PRO SE DEFENDANT

02/24/2020: SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ENLARGEMENT OF TIME ON BEHALF PRO SE DEFENDANT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

02/20/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOY D. GRIFFITH BY LEAVING COPY WITH MR. GRIFFITH (HUSBAND) ON 2/2/20

02/13/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOY D. GRIFFITH BY LEAVING COPY WITH MR. GRIFFITH (HUSBAND) ON 2/2/20

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND AUTOMATIC STAY

06/29/2020: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND AUTOMATIC STAY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

07/20/2020: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Griffith, Joy D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPDWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Griffith, Joy D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOB; Description: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND AUTOMATIC STAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ENLARGEMENT OF TIME ON BEHALF PRO SE DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JOY D. GRIFFITH BY LEAVING COPY WITH MR. GRIFFITH (HUSBAND) ON 2/2/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-4749856 ON 01/21/2020. PAYOR: SHADID & ASSOCIATES INC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-548: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2020-548: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2020-548: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-548: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2020-548: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-548: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2020-548: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2020-548: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-548: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-548: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2020-548: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2020-548: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE PIPES, ROBERT TRENT TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: P; Description: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Conn Appliances, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less