This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 21:32:56 (UTC).

Conn Appliances, Inc, Plaintiff, v. Jimmy Sparger, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Conn Appliances, Inc, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jimmy Sparger, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Burton, Catherine M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-533

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Burton, Catherine M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances, Inc

Defendant

Sparger, Jimmy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOLEY, NEIL

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON, P.C.

P.O.Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/13/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JIMMY SPARGER BY LEAVING COPY WITH JADEN SPARGER ON 2/2/20

02/13/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JIMMY SPARGER BY LEAVING COPY WITH JADEN SPARGER ON 2/2/20

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

02/20/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

06/25/2020: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

06/16/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

07/27/2020: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/30/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF GARNISHMENT

10/14/2020: DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

01/25/2021: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOB; Description: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED PER HELP DESK 102666

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Conn Appliances, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less