This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 21:36:47 (UTC).

Conn Appliances, Inc, Plaintiff, v. Cameron Goldsby, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Conn Appliances, Inc, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cameron Goldsby, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Collins, April. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-551

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Collins, April

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances, Inc

Defendant

Goldsby, Cameron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOLEY, NEIL

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON, P.C.

P.O.Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CAMERON GOLSBY IN PRS BY LVG COPY WITH ARTAVEA DIXON FAMILY MEMBER ON 3-17-2020

03/31/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CAMERON GOLSBY IN PRS BY LVG COPY WITH ARTAVEA DIXON FAMILY MEMBER ON 3-17-2020

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

04/08/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/07/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/02/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/23/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/23/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

11/30/2020: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

06/21/2021: RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RSJ; Description: RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: STCA; Description: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Default Judgment; Party Details; Defendant: Goldsby, Cameron

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDJ; Description: JUDGE COLLINS JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SIGNED; Count: 1; Party: Goldsby, Cameron

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MODJ; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: MATTHEW S. WEST PHALEN THRU SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO KENDRA WESPHALEN (WIFE) RESIDENT/FAMILY AT ADDRESS ON 8/18/2020 - ENTERED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Conn Appliances, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less