This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 13:09:45 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A., ET. AL. V. BROOK ESCHETE

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BROOK ESCHETE. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WEEDON, JILL C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0078

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WEEDON, JILL C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC

ASSIGNEE OF

CITIBANK N.A.

CITI THANKYOU PREFERRED

Defendant

ESCHETE, BROOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CASTRO, MICHAEL

Rausch Sturm, 5200 S Yale Ave Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FIL & SCANNED

12/20/2019: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FIL & SCANNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CASE IS DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND NO SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: JCW/DM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CASE CONTINUED TO JANUARY 28, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M.; NO

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTRO, MICHAEL