This case was last updated from Atoka County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 01:48:56 (UTC).

CINDY WILLIS V. FOMBY & SONS TOWING

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 CINDY WILLIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FOMBY SONS TOWING. This case was filed in Atoka County Courts, Atoka County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HARBUCK, PRESTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0051

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Atoka, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HARBUCK, PRESTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIS, CINDY

Defendant

FOMBY & SONS TOWING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE - CASE ORDERED DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 7-6-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE 1ST ALIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE - ALIAS SERVICE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF'S FEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less