This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 10:57:28 (UTC).

Christian Michael Hammons, Plaintiff, v. State Of Oklahoma, Defendant, and Department Of Public Safety, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Christian Michael Hammons, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against State Of Oklahoma, Defendant, and Department Of Public Safety, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****21-2

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hammons, Christian Michael

Defendants

Department Of Public Safety

State Of Oklahoma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Longacre, J.p.

117 N Central

Idabel, OK 74745

 

Court Documents

CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.

01/20/2021: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.

ORDER FOR HEARING

01/20/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING

COMES ON TODAY FOR HEARING ON PETITION. MATTERS ARE STRICKEN BY REQUEST OF THE PLAIN .

04/12/2021: COMES ON TODAY FOR HEARING ON PETITION. MATTERS ARE STRICKEN BY REQUEST OF THE PLAIN .

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

SET ASIDE ORDER

03/23/2022: SET ASIDE ORDER

CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

04/08/2022: CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Department Of Public Safety

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: State Of Oklahoma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSITION HEARING DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: SET ASIDE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: COMES ON TODAY FOR HEARING ON PETITION. MATTERS ARE STRICKEN BY REQUEST OF THE PLAIN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-88179 ON 01/20/2021. PAYOR: ROWLAND LAW FIRM TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 164.14. LINE ITEMS: CV-2021-2: $85.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CV-2021-2: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CV-2021-2: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CV-2021-2: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CV-2021-2: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CV-2021-2: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CV-2021-2: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CV-2021-2: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CV-2021-2: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CV-2021-2: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CV-2021-2: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CV-2021-2: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DEBERRY, MICHAEL D. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: APPLDL; Description: APPLICATION RE: REVOCATION OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: APPLICATION RE: REVOCATION OF DRIVERS LICENSE(APPLDL); Filed By: Hammons, Christian Michael

    Read MoreRead Less