This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:59:14 (UTC).

CHOCTAW HOME FINANCE CORP. V. MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 CHOCTAW HOME FINANCE CORP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBERRY, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DEBERRY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOCTAW HOME FINANCE CORP.

Defendants

HEAD, CHRISTINA BURTON

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

AND

JEFFERSON CAPTITOL SYSTEMS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WOLF, FRANK III

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P O Box 726

Hugo, OK 74743

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

01/18/2022: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: CONFIRMATION OF SHERIFF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER CONFIRMING SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAIN 'S MOTION TO CONFIRM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLF, FRANK III