This case was last updated from Craig County Courts on 05/10/2022 at 12:31:47 (UTC).

CHEVELLE DAWN BALDRIDGE V. WILLIAM NEWTON CROFFORD III

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 CHEVELLE DAWN BALDRIDGE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAM NEWTON CROFFORD III. This case was filed in Craig County Courts, Craig County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CROSSON, HONORABLE TERRELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0011

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Craig, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CROSSON, HONORABLE TERRELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALDRIDGE, CHEVELLE DAWN

Defendant

CROFFORD, WILLIAM NEWTON III

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT & ORDER

01/26/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ORDER

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

02/26/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2026
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,136.50 PLUS COST AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WITH 1 WITNESS. DEF PRESENT. TESTIMONIES HEARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: NO CR: JUDGE CROSSON PRESIDING. PLAIN PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE.. SERVED 01/26/2021 BY SHF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS ISSUED SHERIFF CRAIG; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less