This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 09:44:57 (UTC).

CHERRY LESLEY V. VANESSA RENEE CREEDEN

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 CHERRY LESLEY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against VANESSA RENEE CREEDEN. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROOKS, CARSON M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0354

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROOKS, CARSON M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LESLEY, CHERRY

Defendant

CREEDEN, VANESSA RENEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLUS POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: C/MINUTE, FILED - DEFAULT JUDGMENT:$108 COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF'S RETURN, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER ISSUED SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER FILED; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less