This case was last updated from Osage County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 18:08:19 (UTC).

CHEROKEE HERITAGE APTS, ET. AL. V. DAVID P PANKEY

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 CHEROKEE HERITAGE APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVID P PANKEY. This case was filed in Osage County Courts, Osage County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is TATE, STUART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0148

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Osage, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

TATE, STUART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHEROKEE HERITAGE APTS

JAMES, JOHNNA

Defendant

PANKEY, DAVID P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THEREAFTER PLTF MAY SEEK WRIT OF ASSISTANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PEMISIS BY SUNDAT JULY 15 2018 @ 5 PM. IF DEFT REMAINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: N BIGHORN #21 SKIATOOK OK OSAGE COUNTY. DEFT TO VACATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF 50.00. PLTF AWARDED POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY 114

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF 359.00 PLUS COURT COSTS OF 58.00 AND SERVICE FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPEAR. SERVICE IS GOOD. JUDGMENT TO PLTF IN THE AMOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING. PLTF JOHNNA JAMES AND DEFT DAVID PANKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SC CM; JUDGE TATE ON FOR FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 6/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER RETURNED SERVING DAVID PAIL PANKEY ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER ISSUED BY OCSO FOR RESP; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less