This case was last updated from Adair County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 07:31:40 (UTC).

CHEROKEE CLOUD, Plaintiff, v. OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 CHEROKEE CLOUD, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION, Defendant. This case was filed in Adair County Courts, Adair County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Brown, L. Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-46

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Adair, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Brown, L. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLOUD, CHEROKEE

Defendant

OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK, MARGARET

Po Box 1937

Tahlequah, OK 74465

Defendant Attorney

SZYMAK, CHRISTIN L

2401 N. Lincoln Blvd, Po Box 53039

Oklahoma City, OK 73152

Other Attorneys

HUFF, HEATHER

Will Rogers Memorial Office Building 2401 N. Lincoln Boulevard Po Box 53039

Oklahoma City, OK 73152

 

Court Documents

PETITION

07/06/2021: PETITION

SUMMONS FEE

07/06/2021: SUMMONS FEE

ANSWER OF APPELLEE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION

08/06/2021: ANSWER OF APPELLEE OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CHRISTIN L SZYMAK

08/06/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CHRISTIN L SZYMAK

AUTHORIZATION:OF CLIENT TO REPRESENTATION BY LICENSED LEGAL INTERN

08/06/2021: AUTHORIZATION:OF CLIENT TO REPRESENTATION BY LICENSED LEGAL INTERN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ANSWER OF APPELLEE OKLAHOMAEMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, AND AUTHORIZATION OF CLIENT TO REPRESENTATION BY LICENSED LEGAL INTERN

08/17/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ANSWER OF APPELLEE OKLAHOMAEMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, AND AUTHORIZATION OF CLIENT TO REPRESENTATION BY LICENSED LEGAL INTERN

ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET#21-AT-05179-BR)

09/08/2021: ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET#21-AT-05179-BR)

ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05178-BR)

09/08/2021: ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05178-BR)

ANSWER BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05176-BR)

09/08/2021: ANSWER BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05176-BR)

ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05177-BR)

09/08/2021: ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05177-BR)

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE HEATHER N HUFF

10/27/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE HEATHER N HUFF

DISMISSAL

01/26/2022: DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED; Other; Party Details; Plaintiff: CLOUD, CHEROKEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISM; Description: DISMISSAL; Party: CLOUD, CHEROKEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE HEATHER N HUFF; Party: CLOUD, CHEROKEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05177-BR); Party: CLOUD, CHEROKEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05176-BR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET #21-AT-05178-BR); Party: CLOUD, CHEROKEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF BOARD OF REVIEW (DOCKET#21-AT-05179-BR); Party: CLOUD, CHEROKEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ANSWER OF APPELLEE OKLAHOMAEMPLOYMENT SECURITY COMMISSION, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, AND AUTHORIZATION OF CLIENT TO REPRESENTATION BY LICENSED LEGAL INTERN; Party: CLOUD, CHEROKEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AUTH; Description: AUTHORIZATION:OF CLIENT TO REPRESENTATION BY LICENSED LEGAL INTERN; Party: OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-CHRISTIN L SZYMAK; Party: OKLAHOMA EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: APPEALOSC; Description: APPEAL- OKLAHOMA SECURITY COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: APPEAL- OKLAHOMA SECURITY COMMISSION(APPEALOSC); Filed By: CLOUD, CHEROKEE

    Read MoreRead Less