This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 21:04:43 (UTC).

CHARLES STICKLER, ET. AL. V. OCCUPANTS, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 CHARLES STICKLER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is LOWE, GINA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0011

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

LOWE, GINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STICKLER, CHARLES

CARPENTER, DEVIN

Defendants

OCCUPANTS

WOOD, RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

ISSUE FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER

01/11/2021: ISSUE FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER

VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE

01/11/2021: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE

ISSUE ALIAS FED AFFIDAVIT - 2-1-2021

01/22/2021: ISSUE ALIAS FED AFFIDAVIT - 2-1-2021

RET ALIAS FED, SERVED RUSSELL WOOD BY LEAVING COPY WITH

01/26/2021: RET ALIAS FED, SERVED RUSSELL WOOD BY LEAVING COPY WITH

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

02/01/2021: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FATHER-IN-LAW 1-26-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RET ALIAS FED, SERVED RUSSELL WOOD BY LEAVING COPY WITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE ALIAS FED AFFIDAVIT - 2-1-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO QUIT

    Read MoreRead Less