******0-60
01/23/2020
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Residential Eviction
Rogers, Oklahoma
Smith, David
Chapel Ridge Investors of Claremore, LLC. DBA: Claremore Creek Apartments
Washington, Kristyn Leeann
01/23/2020: RESIDENT CHARGES/PAYMENTS LEDGER
01/30/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
01/23/2020: AFFIDAVIT
01/29/2020: JUDGE SMITH NO CR COMES ON FOR FED1 HEARING EVANGELA POSTMAN PRESENT FOR PLAIN , SWORN DEFENDANT APPEARS NOT SERVICE BY POSTING FED ONLY GRANTED PROPERTY TO BE VACATED BY 2-1-2020 @ 11:59PM
01/28/2020: ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED KRYSTIN WASHINGTON / BY POSTING / 1-23-20 / WITH AFFIDAVIT ATTACHED) $50
01/07/2021: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT
DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED;; Party Details; Defendant: Washington, Kristyn Leeann
[-] Read LessDocketCode: RSJ; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT
[-] Read LessDispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Washington, Kristyn Leeann
[-] Read LessDocketCode: JEDF; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
[-] Read LessHearingEvent: FED1($1348.50 + $108.00 CC); Docket: David Smith
[-] Read LessDocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SMITH; NO CR COMES ON FOR FED1 HEARING; EVANGELA POSTMAN PRESENT FOR PLAIN , SWORN; DEFENDANT APPEARS NOT; SERVICE BY POSTING; FED ONLY GRANTED; PROPERTY TO BE VACATED BY 2-1-2020 @ 11:59PM
[-] Read LessDocketCode: RET; Description: ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED KRYSTIN WASHINGTON / BY POSTING / 1-23-20 / WITH AFFIDAVIT ATTACHED) $50
[-] Read LessDocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-609383 ON 01/23/2020. PAYOR: PROPERTIES/WILHOIT TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 108.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2020-60: $43.88 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2020-60: $48.75 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2020-60: $2.70 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. SC-2020-60: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2020-60: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.
[-] Read LessDocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:SC-2020-60: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18SC-2020-60: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15SC-2020-60: AC08 SHERIFF FEES -$1.25SC-2020-60: AC01 CLERK FEES -$1.12
[-] Read LessDocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 2.70
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SMITH, DAVID TO THIS CASE.
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: RESIDENT CHARGES/PAYMENTS LEDGER
[-] Read LessDocketCode: SMIS; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00
[-] Read LessDocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00
[-] Read LessDocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00
[-] Read LessDocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00
[-] Read LessDocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1
[-] Read LessDocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: Chapel Ridge Investors of Claremore, LLC. DBA: Claremore Creek Apartments
[-] Read Less